U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-03002
  • Case Name: Sandton Credit Solutions Master Fund III, LP v. Pierce
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • January 08, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 08, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
December, 2019
  • December 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • November 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • October 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • October 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.