U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Horned Eagle et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 17, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2025: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 14, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 13, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • March 13, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 12, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 04, 2024: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 01, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 23, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 17, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • August 17, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 17, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Text Order of Detention]
  • August 09, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 22, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 22, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 11, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 28, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 28, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 28, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 28, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 16, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 16, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 15, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 15, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 02, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 23, 2019: [Extend]
  • December 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 31, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 31, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 31, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 30, 2019: [Notice]
  • October 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 25, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • October 24, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • October 23, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 23, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 23, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2019: [Request]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 17, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 17, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 17, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 16, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 16, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.