U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-50179
  • Case Name: Michael Lee Pickett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Case Reassigned]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (text order)]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 25, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • October 25, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Professional (text order)]
  • July 19, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Professional]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Report of Sale (text entry only)]
  • March 16, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 14, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 23, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amend Order]
  • February 13, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 11, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • February 11, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amend Order (no notice required)]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 27, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Property]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • September 29, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Property]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Adversary Case]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Transcript (First Meeting of Creditors)]
October, 2020
  • October 17, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Amendment]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Petition with Notice]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.