U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Briggs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • August 31, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • August 31, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 27, 2020: [Memorandum Letter]
  • August 24, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 11, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • May 11, 2020: [Competency Hearing]
  • May 06, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 05, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 01, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Competency Report]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 28, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 28, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • January 03, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 03, 2020: [Competency Evaluation]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 14, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 14, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 12, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 12, 2019: [Suppress]
  • November 05, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 03, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 29, 2019: [Request]
  • October 29, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 29, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 28, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 25, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2019: [Request]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 22, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.