U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Duncan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 18, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 22, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 27, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 27, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 25, 2020: [Extend]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 22, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 06, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 29, 2019: [Request]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 28, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 28, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 28, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2019: [Request]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.