U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ceballos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 27, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 27, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 20, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 20, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 19, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 19, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 19, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Extend]
  • July 19, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 28, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • May 24, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2021: [Objection]
  • May 18, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [In Limine]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 09, 2021: [Request]
  • March 08, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Request]
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • August 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • June 15, 2020: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 10, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 13, 2020: [Transcript]
  • May 06, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • May 06, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 06, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • April 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Transcript]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 17, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 12, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 04, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Reply]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Extend]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 16, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 02, 2020: [Extend]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Suppress]
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 23, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 17, 2019: [Brief]
  • December 17, 2019: [Leave to]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Brief]
  • October 25, 2019: [Leave to]
  • October 18, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.