U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rabbitt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 05, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2021: [Extend]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 21, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • August 24, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 29, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 29, 2021: [Consent]
  • July 29, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 27, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 27, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 27, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2021: [Request]
  • June 07, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [Request]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing (FOR COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 03, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • June 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.