U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • September 22, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 21, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 18, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 14, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 24, 2020: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 18, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 18, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 18, 2020: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 18, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 08, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 08, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 20, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 19, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 19, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 25, 2019: [Request]
  • October 24, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 24, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • October 24, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 24, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • October 23, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 23, 2019: [Request]
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 18, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.