U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Halfred
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 15, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 15, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • June 15, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 01, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • May 21, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 18, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • May 12, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order]
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • February 27, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • February 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 24, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 18, 2020: [Furlough]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 28, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 08, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 06, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 21, 2019: [Sealed Evaluation]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • October 18, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 18, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 18, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 18, 2019: [Request]
  • October 18, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.