U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moccasin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 09, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 24, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • July 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 25, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 25, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 09, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 04, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 28, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 21, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 18, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 01, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 16, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 16, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 13, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 13, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 13, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 04, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • December 04, 2019: [Bail Report]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 29, 2019: [Request]
  • October 29, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 29, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 29, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 28, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 25, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2019: [Request]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 22, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.