U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Twin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • November 19, 2020: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • November 19, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • November 18, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • November 18, 2020: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 18, 2020: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • November 18, 2020: [Verdict]
  • November 18, 2020: [Jury Question]
  • November 18, 2020: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 18, 2020: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • November 18, 2020: [Jury List]
  • November 16, 2020: [Memorandum Letter]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • November 16, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • November 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2020: [Exhibit List (attorney use)]
  • November 16, 2020: [Witness List]
  • November 16, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 13, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • November 13, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Brief]
  • October 22, 2020: [Request]
  • October 22, 2020: [In Limine]
  • October 22, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 22, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • October 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 19, 2020: [Extend]
  • October 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2020: [Memorandum Letter]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 01, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 29, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 08, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 05, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 05, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 05, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 05, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • June 05, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 05, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 04, 2020: [Request]
  • June 02, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order]
  • June 01, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 01, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.