U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Makes Room For Them
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 18, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 13, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 12, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 12, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • May 11, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 05, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 28, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 09, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 24, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 24, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 24, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • October 24, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • October 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 23, 2019: [Request]
  • October 22, 2019: [Request]
  • October 22, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 18, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.