U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goodlow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 10, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 03, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Text Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 15, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 14, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 08, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2021: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 21, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 16, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Furlough]
  • August 27, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 26, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 21, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial]
  • August 19, 2020: [Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 19, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 19, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 19, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 14, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • August 12, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 12, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 12, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 06, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2020: [Sentencing]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 21, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 21, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 24, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 11, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 11, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • February 07, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 05, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 05, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • January 21, 2020: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 21, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 16, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 27, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • November 27, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 27, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 27, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • November 27, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 28, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 28, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 25, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 25, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2019: [Request]
  • October 24, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 18, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.