U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ritter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 18, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 06, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 06, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 06, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 06, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 06, 2022: [Text Order of Detention]
  • April 06, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 03, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 30, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 13, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 30, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Request]
  • October 25, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 25, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • October 25, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 25, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • October 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2019: [Request]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 18, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.