U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Farmer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 22, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 04, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 21, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 25, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 25, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 19, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 06, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 06, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 05, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 29, 2021: [Consent]
  • July 29, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 27, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 23, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 03, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing (FOR COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 02, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2021: [Bail Report]
  • June 01, 2021: [Request]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 27, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 27, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 23, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 20, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order]
  • April 16, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 16, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 05, 2021: [Extend]
  • April 02, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 29, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 28, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 28, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 03, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 03, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Indictment]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 22, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 15, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2020: [Request]
  • September 11, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • September 11, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 11, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing (FOR COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 11, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 11, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 11, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 11, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 11, 2020: [Request]
  • September 10, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • September 09, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 04, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 04, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.