U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Collins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 20, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [Request]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 20, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • September 20, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • September 20, 2021: [Sentencing]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 20, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 10, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 10, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 28, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 23, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 14, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 27, 2021: [Consent]
  • May 27, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 27, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 26, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 26, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 26, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 25, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 24, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 24, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 24, 2021: [In Limine]
  • May 24, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • May 19, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 11, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 10, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • September 24, 2020: [Seal Existing Document]
  • September 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 04, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 08, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 06, 2020: [In Limine]
  • July 06, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice]
  • July 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 05, 2020: [Letter]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 27, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 06, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 06, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 27, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 23, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 23, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 23, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • October 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 18, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 18, 2019: [Request]
  • October 18, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.