U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Neck
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 17, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 04, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 16, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 14, 2022: [Text Order of Detention]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 25, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 20, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 31, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 31, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 24, 2020: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 24, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 24, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • July 21, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 26, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 07, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 07, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 24, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 24, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 10, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2020: [Request]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 03, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 31, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 31, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • January 31, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 31, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 31, 2020: [Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 31, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 31, 2020: [Request]
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 31, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 31, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.