U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 14, 2025: [Furlough]
  • April 03, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 21, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 08, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 24, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 19, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 19, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 19, 2021: [Information - Felony]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 21, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 21, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 16, 2021: [Request]
  • March 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 10, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • February 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 05, 2021: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • February 02, 2021: [Status Conference]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Notice]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 08, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 08, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 23, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 20, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 24, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 24, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 19, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • March 19, 2020: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • March 19, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 10, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 10, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 04, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 31, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 30, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 29, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 23, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 23, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 23, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 18, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 18, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 18, 2019: [Request]
  • October 17, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 17, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.