U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Diaz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 12, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 04, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.