U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-40498
  • Case Name: Sven Eric Thompson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
December, 2019
  • December 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • December 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appointment Rejection]
  • October 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.