U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mathison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • September 12, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 12, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • September 12, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 12, 2022: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 07, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 29, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 29, 2022: [Oral Scheduling Order]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 15, 2022: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • June 14, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 08, 2022: [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 21, 2021: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • December 21, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 15, 2021: [Furlough]
  • December 15, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2021: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 08, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 08, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 06, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 03, 2021: [Furlough]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 24, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 24, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 24, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 24, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 09, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 09, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 09, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 09, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 25, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Response]
  • November 04, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 04, 2019: [Request]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 04, 2019: [Bail Report]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 18, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.