U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-40499
  • Case Name: Brandon Michael Peterson and Rebecca Lynn Peterson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Debtor Education]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
July, 2021
  • July 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Application 1,000 or Less (without notice)]
  • July 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • July 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Automatic Stay]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Proof of Claim]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
November, 2020
  • November 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Claim]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • November 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
October, 2020
  • October 31, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • August 23, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • July 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • May 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • May 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • May 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
April, 2020
  • April 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Substitute Redacted Proof of Claim (Text Order)]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Substitute Redacted Proof of Claim]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transcript (Depositions and 2004 Exams Only)]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
January, 2020
  • January 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amend Order]
  • January 17, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amend Order (No Notice Required)]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Time]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Time]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Automatic Stay]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice (Nonstandard)]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • November 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Examination 2004]
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Examination (2004)]
  • November 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Corrective Entry]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.