U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Glenn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 17, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 13, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 10, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 04, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 04, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 04, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 22, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 09, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 07, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 07, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 07, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 06, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 06, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 06, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 24, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 24, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 26, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 18, 2019: [Request]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 21, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 21, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.