U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oldson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 01, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 01, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 05, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 05, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 19, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 19, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 05, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 04, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • March 04, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 25, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 25, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Competency Report]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • October 16, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 17, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 17, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 13, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 10, 2020: [Letter]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Text Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Letter]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 22, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 22, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 15, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 14, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 14, 2020: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 08, 2020: [Status Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 18, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 18, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 18, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 13, 2020: [Request]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 21, 2020: [Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 24, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 23, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 23, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 21, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.