U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:02-cr-30088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Escarsega
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 07, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 09, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 14, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Letter]
  • July 21, 2021: [Letter]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 12, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 12, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 07, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 06, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 23, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 16, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 05, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 28, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 28, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 28, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 28, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • October 28, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 28, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 28, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 28, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 24, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 21, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.