U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 01-41372
  • Case Name: Jerry Wayne Luther and Jean Marie Luther
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Release Funds from Court Registry]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Unclaimed Funds Supporting Documentation]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Payment of Unclaimed Funds]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.