U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Houseman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 04, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2020: [Sentencing]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 23, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 23, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 23, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 28, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 21, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 06, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 06, 2020: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 27, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 26, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 23, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 20, 2019: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 06, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Request]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 04, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • October 31, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 30, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 23, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 23, 2019: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.