U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Desersa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • July 21, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • June 07, 2022: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • June 07, 2022: [Quash]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 22, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 18, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 24, 2021: [Furlough]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 13, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 12, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Consent]
  • April 12, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 08, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2021: [Sentencing]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 31, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 31, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 11, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 12, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 30, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 21, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 21, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 24, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 14, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 31, 2019: [Request]
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 25, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.