U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawk Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 21, 2020: [Consent]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 19, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 19, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 19, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 19, 2020: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • February 10, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 20, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 11, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 11, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2019: [Request]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 30, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 30, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.