U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Seales
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 22, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • June 16, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 16, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 09, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 09, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 09, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 13, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 13, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 24, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • February 21, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 19, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 19, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 19, 2020: [Consent]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 14, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 14, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 14, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 18, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Request]
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 01, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 01, 2019: [Bail Report]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 30, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.