U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jealous Of Him
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 11, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice]
  • January 07, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 03, 2020: [Extend]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 11, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 11, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 22, 2019: [Request]
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • November 21, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 21, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 21, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.