U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 28, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 27, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • July 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
  • July 20, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 20, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 15, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 15, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 12, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 14, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 14, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 08, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 06, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 06, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 30, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • April 01, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 31, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2020: [Consent]
  • March 10, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2020: [Notice]
  • March 04, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 04, 2020: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • March 03, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • February 28, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 28, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 17, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2019: [Request]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 24, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 23, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 23, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 23, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 23, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 23, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 23, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 23, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 23, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 23, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.