U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buchholz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 18, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 07, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 07, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 07, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2020: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • August 06, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 06, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 27, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 25, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • February 12, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 31, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 31, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 10, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 18, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 07, 2019: [Request]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 06, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 06, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 06, 2019: [Waiver]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 01, 2019: [Bail Report]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 30, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.