U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Long
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • August 26, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • August 24, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Objection]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2020: [Supplement]
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice]
  • February 28, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 26, 2019: [Request]
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 22, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 21, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 21, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.