U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kills Back
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 02, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 01, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • June 26, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 26, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 24, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 24, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 24, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order]
  • April 29, 2020: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 29, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 29, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 29, 2020: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 23, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 23, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 23, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 03, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 04, 2019: [Request]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 31, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 30, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 30, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 30, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.