U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bocanegra
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 11, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • June 11, 2021: [Forfeiture]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 08, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • April 08, 2021: [Declaration of Publication]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Consent]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 19, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 09, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 09, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 08, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 08, 2020: [Consent]
  • July 08, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 30, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 30, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 30, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 18, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Request]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 31, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 30, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.