U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Island
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 20, 2022: [Supplement]
  • July 19, 2022: [Extend]
  • July 19, 2022: [Supplement]
  • July 19, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • July 05, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • April 14, 2022: [Response]
  • April 07, 2022: [Supplement]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • March 31, 2022: [Admission]
  • March 29, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 31, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 28, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 28, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 22, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 22, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • July 01, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 01, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 24, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 19, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 11, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 09, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 09, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 05, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 04, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 01, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 01, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 21, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 09, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 14, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 14, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 14, 2020: [Consent]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 11, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 11, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 11, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2019: [Request]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 08, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 07, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.