U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-40503
  • Case Name: Aaron Sommervold Kasch and Mary Sommervold Kasch
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Closing Case]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (debtor) (text entry only)]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit]
  • June 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Obtain Credit/Incur Debt]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Proof of Claim]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Claim]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
December, 2019
  • December 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reply]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • December 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • October 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.