U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50146-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garnette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2022: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 23, 2022: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 16, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 22, 2022: [Extend]
  • April 11, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • January 05, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 29, 2021: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • December 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 29, 2021: [In Limine]
  • December 28, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 22, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 22, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 09, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [1 - Ex Parte Document]
  • July 30, 2021: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • July 16, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 15, 2021: [Objection]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 14, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 14, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 12, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 12, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 09, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 09, 2021: [In Limine]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Brief]
  • April 02, 2021: [In Limine]
  • April 02, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • March 23, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 23, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • March 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 21, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 11, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 30, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [Request]
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.