U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bachmann
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • July 30, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
  • July 28, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 21, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 20, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 20, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 14, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 14, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 14, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 13, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • May 12, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 12, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 12, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 12, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 03, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 08, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 08, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • November 08, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Request]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 01, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 01, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 25, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 24, 2019: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.