U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Olson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating SR / Probation]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • September 22, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • September 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 14, 2021: [Extend]
  • September 14, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 01, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 30, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 19, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 19, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 18, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 06, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 09, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 09, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 28, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 28, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 25, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 25, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 31, 2020: [Furlough]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 30, 2019: [Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 25, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • November 25, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 04, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 25, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 25, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 25, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 25, 2019: [Request]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.