U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Staples
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 04, 2022: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 03, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 26, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 26, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 15, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 15, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 15, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 06, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 31, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 27, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 18, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 12, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 12, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order]
  • December 06, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 06, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 06, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.