U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anduja
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 27, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 12, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 18, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 01, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 13, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 13, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 21, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 21, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 13, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 13, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • May 11, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 11, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 10, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 17, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 17, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 31, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 31, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 31, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 18, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 07, 2019: [Request]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 30, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 30, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 30, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 29, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.