U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cummings
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 25, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • July 25, 2022: [Declaration of Publication]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 16, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 20, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 19, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 18, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 18, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 13, 2020: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • August 10, 2020: [Status Conference]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 29, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 29, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [For Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 19, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 19, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 28, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Evaluation]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 27, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 20, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 19, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • November 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 19, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 14, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 31, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 31, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • October 31, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • October 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 31, 2019: [Request]
  • October 31, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 31, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 31, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 31, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.