U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bennington
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 20, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 20, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Extend]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 10, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 22, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 22, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 31, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 31, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 31, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 31, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 31, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.