U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Byker et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence (Part A & B Criminal History Amendment)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 28, 2025: [Reduce Sentence (Part A & B Criminal History Amendment)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Transcript]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • August 24, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 24, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
  • July 02, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 02, 2020: [Notice]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 23, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • June 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 08, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 05, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 04, 2020: [Sealed Evaluation]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 29, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 29, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 28, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 22, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 12, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 12, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 11, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 04, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 04, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 09, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 10, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 10, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 10, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 20, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 20, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 19, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Request]
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 04, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 04, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 04, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 01, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.