U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Plante
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 11, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 01, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 01, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 01, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 20, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 20, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 10, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 02, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • September 28, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 28, 2020: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 28, 2020: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 28, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 17, 2020: [Request]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 11, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 11, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 27, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 08, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 08, 2019: [Request]
  • November 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 06, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Request]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 04, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 04, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 04, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 04, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.