U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. High Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 25, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 20, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 03, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 04, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 29, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 15, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 25, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 25, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 25, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.