U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vargas-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 09, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 02, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 03, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 03, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 03, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 13, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 13, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Request]
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 07, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 06, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 06, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 06, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 06, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 06, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.