U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rojas-Espinoza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 03, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 30, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 09, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • November 07, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Response]
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 06, 2019: [Request]
  • November 06, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 06, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 06, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 06, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.